Herman v. Performant Recovery, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracy Herman
Defendant: Performant Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01521
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: The Court DENIES #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case as moot. The Court GRANTS #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Tracy Herman. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/1/2020. (SMM)
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Tracy Herman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tracked Complaint)(Pontello, Dominic)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: The Court DENIES without prejudice #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Plaintiff Tracy Herman for failure to comply to the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/30/2020. (SMM)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Performant Recovery, Inc. Amendment to #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Jury Demand demand, , filed by Tracy Herman. Related document: #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Tracy Herman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Pontello, Dominic)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Plaintiff Tracy Herman. (Pontello, Dominic)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc.. (Dickinson, Joshua)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc.. (Dickinson, Joshua)
November 2, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CBL)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/30/2020. (SMM)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc.. (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Shilee T. Mullin for Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc.. (Mullin, Shilee)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Tracy Herman.(MFG)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Performant Recovery, Inc.. Parent companies: Performant Business Services, Inc.; Performant Financial Corporation,. (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Charles County, case number 2011-AC04215, with receipt number AMOEDC-8235384, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Performant Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 23, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herman v. Performant Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Herman
Represented By: Dominic M. Pontello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performant Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?