R.L.P. Development Co., Inc. v. Shoe Sensation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R.L.P. Development Co., Inc.
Defendant: Shoe Sensation, Inc. and All Known and Unknown Occupants
Case Number: 4:2020cv01533
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 ***REMARK Re: #21 - Pursuant to Rule 26 - 3.02; In civil actions, discovery and disclosure materials pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, and 36, and the certificates of their service, shall not be filed with the Court except as exhibits to a motion or memorandum. (See Local Rule 26-3.02 located on the court website.) (TMT)
December 14, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER Rule 26 Disclosures by Plaintiff R.L.P. Development Co., Inc.. (Smith, Katherine)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Motion to Join Parties due by 1/7/2021. Discovery Completion due by 6/15/2021. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2021. ADR Future Reference 1/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14S - St. Louis before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. Pretrial Compliance due by 9/22/2021. Motion in Limine due by 10/2/2021. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on December 9, 2020. (BRP)
December 9, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp: Rule 16 Conference held on 12/9/2020. Conference held by Zoom. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 10:34AM) (proceedings ended: 10:47AM)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Katherine Smith)(Appearance for Defendant: Stephen Kaufmann) (KCD)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Shoe Sensation, Inc.. . (Kaufmann, Stephen)
November 30, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff R.L.P. Development Co., Inc... (Smith, Katherine)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER to Complaint by R.L.P. Development Co., Inc..(Smith, Katherine)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/7/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/9/2020 10:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/19/2020. (TMT)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Forcible Entry and Detainer Complaint by Shoe Sensation, Inc..(Kaufmann, Stephen)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER Re: #12 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine M Smith filed by R.L.P. Development Co., Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/16/2020. (TMT)
November 15, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katherine M Smith. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8281215) by Plaintiff R.L.P. Development Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing certificate of good standing)(Smith, Katherine)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer), (Agreed) by Defendant Shoe Sensation, Inc. (Kaufmann, Stephen); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on October 30, 2020. (BRP)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings (SMM)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Shoe Sensation, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kaufmann, Stephen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer), (Agreed) by Defendant Shoe Sensation, Inc.. (Kaufmann, Stephen)
October 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG)
October 28, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Katherine M. Smith. Review of case shows that Attorney Katherine M. Smith is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (MFG)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Lincoln County, filed by R.L.P. Development Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(MFG)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Shoe Sensation, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Kaufmann, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Shoe Sensation, Inc.. Parent companies: JWC/SSI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, owns 100% of Shoe Sensation, Inc. stock., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kaufmann, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Removal (Revised): by Defendant Shoe Sensation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket and Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Kaufmann, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Lincoln County, Missouri, case number 20L6-CC00112, with receipt number AMOEDC-8241047, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Shoe Sensation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket and Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Kaufmann, Stephen) Modified on 10/26/2020 (KXS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.L.P. Development Co., Inc. v. Shoe Sensation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.L.P. Development Co., Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoe Sensation, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen R. Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Known and Unknown Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?