Philpot v. Gateway Blend, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Gateway Blend, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01540
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading for Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/7/2020. (BRP)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by John E. Petite for Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by Luke Hertenstein for Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Hertenstein, Luke) Modified on 12/4/2020 (BRP).
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading for Defendant Gateway Blend, LLC. (Petite, John) Modified on 12/3/2020 (BRP).
October 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Christopher Brett Vaughn. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (MFG)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MFG)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot Process Server: Pam King Wheetly (MFG)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (MFG)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Gateway Blend, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-8243327, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #7 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #8 Attachment Disclosure of Corporate Interests, #9 Summons Summons, #10 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Vaughn, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philpot v. Gateway Blend, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: Christopher Brett Vaughn
Represented By: Luke Hertenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Blend, LLC
Represented By: John E. Petite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?