Howard v. Bow Wow Properties I, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. Andy Howard, Jr. and Andy Howard, Jr.
Defendant: Bow Wow Properties I, Inc. d/b/a Instacredit Automart and Bow Wow Properties Inc. doing business as Instacredit Automart
Case Number: 4:2020cv01631
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr.'s Motion to Remand #8 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, from which it was removed. All other motions that remain pending in this action are reserved for ruling by that court. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 1/6/21. (NOTE: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet sent via email to St. Louis County arlando.harvey@courts.mo.gov, Jerry.edwards@courts.mo.gov)(ARL)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - proposed First Amended Complaint)(Brody, Bryan)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court filed by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Brody, Bryan)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Brody, Bryan) filed by Andy Howard, Jr.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/18/2020. (KEK)
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Brody, Bryan)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Count I of Plaintiff's Petition by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Brody, Bryan) filed by Andy Howard, Jr. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/9/20. (ARL)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Count I of Plaintiff's Petition by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Brody, Bryan)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court filed by Defendant Bow Wow Properties Inc.. (Kraushaar, Corey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court filed by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bryan Brody)(Brody, Bryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court by Plaintiff Andy Howard, Jr. (Brody, Bryan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :Count I of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendant Bow Wow Properties Inc.. (Kraushaar, Corey)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss :Count I of Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Bow Wow Properties Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kraushaar, Corey)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bow Wow Properties Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kraushaar, Corey)
November 19, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Bow Wow Properties 1 Inc..(MFG)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bow Wow Properties I, Inc. d/b/a Instacredit Automart. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kraushaar, Corey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bow Wow Properties I, Inc. d/b/a Instacredit Automart Sent To: Plaintiff (Kraushaar, Corey)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC04968, with receipt number AMOEDC-8290546, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bow Wow Properties I, Inc. d/b/a Instacredit Automart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment Complete Copy of State Court File)(Kraushaar, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Bow Wow Properties I, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bow Wow Properties I, Inc. d/b/a Instacredit Automart
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bow Wow Properties Inc. doing business as Instacredit Automart
Represented By: Corey L. Kraushaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Andy Howard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Howard, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan E. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?