Howard v. USA
Petitioner: Lawrence L. Howard
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2020cv01632
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3 Memorandum & Order, by Petitioner Lawrence L. Howard filed by Petitioner Lawrence L. Howard. (JAB)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Wed Dec 9 14:53:41 CST 2020 (Olliges, Chelsea)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant shall show cause, in writing and no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, why the instant 2255 motion should not be dismissed as time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's motion to dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if movant fails to comply with this Order, his 2255 motion will be dismissed. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/9/2020. (CLO)
November 18, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Nov 18 16:01:00 CST 2020 (admin,)
November 18, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
November 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Petitioner Lawrence L. Howard. (JWD)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Lawrence L. Howard. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Sayler A. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?