United States of America v. One Hundred and Ten Thousand, Eight Hundred and Ten Dollars
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $110,810.00 U.S. Currency and One Hundred and Ten Thousand, Eight Hundred and Ten Dollars
Case Number: 4:2020cv01673
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Public Notification. (Bateman, Kyle)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return re: complaint and notice; mailed certified on 11/30/2020; delivered on 12/2/2020; party served: Travis Noble. (KXS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return re: complaint and notice; mailed certified on 11/30/2020; delivered on 12/3/2020; party served: Joe Habachy. (KXS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return re: complaint and notice; mailed certified on 11/30/2020; delivered on 12/3/2020; party served: Jesse Star. (KXS)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed party served $110,810, Type of return Complaint and Warrant (TMT)
November 30, 2020 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant One Hundred and Ten Thousand, Eight Hundred and Ten Dollars $110,810.00 U.S. Currency. (MFG) Modified on 11/30/2020 (MFG). Modified on 11/30/2020 (MFG).
November 30, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (MFG)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant One Hundred and Ten Thousand, Eight Hundred and Ten Dollars $110,810.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Bateman, Kyle) Modified on 11/30/2020 (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Hundred and Ten Thousand, Eight Hundred and Ten Dollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $110,810.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred and Ten Thousand, Eight Hundred and Ten Dollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Timothy Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?