Federal Trade Commission v. Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Kenny W Conway, Brandon M Tumber, Joseph H Smith, Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC, Brandon M. Tumber, Kenny W. Conway and Joseph H. Smith
Case Number: 4:2020cv01674
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT: THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED as follows: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/23/2020. (SMM)
December 23, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Permanent Injunction STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Dwyer, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 12/17/2020 re #2 Consent MOTION for Permanent Injunction STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. Defendants Kenny Conway and Joseph Smith appear Pro Se. The Court orders the parties to submit a revised proposed Stipulated Order For Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment no later than Wednesday, December 23, 2020. (Court Reporter:Reagan Fiorino, Reagan_Fiorino@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7989) (proceedings started: 10:33 pm) (proceedings ended: 10:57 am)(Deputy Clerk: J.Bernsen)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Daniel Dwyer, Chistopher Leach, Katherine White)(Appearance for Defendant: Brett Caban) (JAB)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC, Brandon M. Tumber. Parent companies: Milestan Holdings, Inc., Missouri Valley Capital Management, Inc., DCE Holdings, Inc. and BLM Enterprises, Inc., Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Caban, Brett)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Brett B. Caban for Defendants Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC, Brandon M. Tumber. (Caban, Brett)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone status conference on Thursday, December 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The Court instructs Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission to provide notice of this status conference to any defendant without an entry of appearance on file by Monday, December 14, 2020. The parties shall use the Court's conference line at: (877) 873-8018. The access code is: 2829372. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. (Telephone Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/8/2020. (CLO)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/25/2021. (CLO)
December 8, 2020 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #7 (Dwyer, Daniel) Modified text on 12/8/2020 (CLO).
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Trade Commission re: #6 (Dwyer, Daniel) Modified text on 12/8/2020 (CLO).
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Trade Commission Joseph H. Smith waiver signed on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Dwyer, Daniel)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Trade Commission Kenny W. Conway waiver signed on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Dwyer, Daniel)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Trade Commission Brandon M. Tumber waiver signed on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Dwyer, Daniel)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Federal Trade Commission Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC waiver signed on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Dwyer, Daniel)
December 7, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 4. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JWD) [Clerk's note: Case Opening Notification not docketed during initial Quality Control case opening process on 11/25/2020 due to clerical error]
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher Leach for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Leach, Christopher)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Katherine R. White for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (White, Katherine)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Permanent Injunction STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Dwyer, Daniel)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service Request (corporation), #4 Waiver of Service Request (Tumber), #5 Waiver of Service Request (Conway), #6 Waiver of Service Request (Smith), #7 Waiver of Service Form (corporation), #8 Waiver of Service Form (Tumber), #9 Waiver of Service Form (Conway), #10 Waiver of Service Form (Smith), #11 Waiver of Service Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate (corporation))(Dwyer, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny W Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon M Tumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph H Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Recovery Systems, LLC
Represented By: Brett B. Caban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon M. Tumber
Represented By: Brett B. Caban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny W. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Daniel Dwyer
Represented By: Katherine R. White
Represented By: Christopher Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?