Rotogravure, LLC v. Holland Southwest International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rotogravure, LLC
Defendant: Holland Southwest International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01755
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Rotogravure, LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED until February 12, 2021. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/3/21. (JEB)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Consent Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Rotogravure, LLC. (Blackwell, Andrew)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. Parent companies: Gillebaard USA, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Lamping, Meghan)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joann Gillebaard)(Lamping, Meghan)
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. (Lamping, Meghan)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/30/2021.) (TMT)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (ECF No. 9) is GRANTED until January 22, 2021. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/20/21. (JEB)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, // CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. (Lamping, Meghan)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin M. Cushing for Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. (Cushing, Kevin)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Meghan M. Lamping for Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. (Lamping, Meghan)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah J Klebolt for Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc.. (Klebolt, Sarah)
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Rotogravure, LLC. Holland Southwest International, Inc. served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Blackwell, Andrew)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Rotogravure, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Blackwell, Andrew)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc., Plaintiff Rotogravure, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 12/25/2020.) (TMT)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Rotogravure, LLC Process Server: William J. Kesman - VeriServe Solutions Inc (Blackwell, Andrew)
December 14, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Andrew W. Blackwell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Holland Southwest International, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-8339426, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Rotogravure, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email dated November 28, 2018, #2 Exhibit B - Email dated December 4, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - C - Email dated August 31, 2020, #4 Exhibit D - Screenshot of Hollands website, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons)(Blackwell, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rotogravure, LLC v. Holland Southwest International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rotogravure, LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland Southwest International, Inc.
Represented By: Meghan M. Lamping
Represented By: Sarah J Klebolt
Represented By: Kevin M. Cushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?