Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C. v. Powers
Plaintiff: Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.
Defendant: Ryan Powers
Case Number: 4:2020cv01809
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; attorney/firm Nathan E. Ross and Ethan W. Gee of Ross & Voytas, LLC by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Ross, Nathan) filed by Ryan Powers; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Nathan E. Ross terminated. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 2/9/2021. (KEK)
February 8, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Nathan E. Ross and Ethan W. Gee of Ross & Voytas, LLC by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Ross, Nathan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint And Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C. by Ryan Powers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bohm, David)
February 5, 2021 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by David R. Bohm for Defendant Ryan Powers. (Bohm, David)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #21 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice scott matasar. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8428340) by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing OH Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing MD Certificate, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing OH Certificate, # 4 Certificate of Good Standing NY Certificate)(Matasar, Scott) filed by Ryan Powers ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/28/2021. (NEP)
January 26, 2021 Filing 21 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice scott matasar. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8428340) by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing OH Certificate, #2 Certificate of Good Standing MD Certificate, #3 Certificate of Good Standing OH Certificate, #4 Certificate of Good Standing NY Certificate)(Matasar, Scott)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File; Extension to file the following: Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; Proposed extension date February 5, 2021 by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Ross, Nathan) filed by Ryan Powers; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Ryan Powers answer due 2/5/2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 01/20/2021. (ANP)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint ;Proposed extension date February 5, 2021 by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Ross, Nathan)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer A. Lesny. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8359769) by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing NY and Ohio)(Lesny, Jennifer) filed by Ryan Powers ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/8/2021. (NEP)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL re #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer A. Lesny. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8359769) by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Ohio)(Lesny, Jennifer)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File ; Extension to file the following: Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; Proposed extension date January 22, 2021 by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Ross, Nathan) filed by Ryan Powers; ORDERED GRANTED Ryan Powers answer due 1/22/2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 1/8/2021. (KEK)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint ;Proposed extension date January 22, 2021 by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Ross, Nathan)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER...[See Order for Complete Details]. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/22/2020. (NEP)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan E. Ross for Defendant Ryan Powers. (Ross, Nathan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer A. Lesny. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8359769) by Defendant Ryan Powers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing NY and Ohio)(Lesny, Jennifer)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re 10 Docket Text Order with Schedules, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Order by Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.. (Paillou, Caroline)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 12/22/2020 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/21/20. (ARL)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction set for 12/22/2020 02:00 PM by Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Defendant's response if any, to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is due by no later than Monday, December 21, 2020. Re: #4 Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/18/20. (ARL) Modified on 12/18/2020 (ARL).
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline Belle Paillou for Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.. (Paillou, Caroline)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Requesting Hearing: by Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C. re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ferrick, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Bond by Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.. (Ferrick, James) Modified on 12/18/2020 (JWD). [Clerk's note: document is a Proposed Injunction Bond. No motion attached.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.. (Ferrick, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrick, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Ferrick, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C. (Ferrick, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Ryan Powers with receipt number AMOEDC-8354988, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration J Fandl, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration S Fandl, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form, #10 Summons)(Ferrick, James)
December 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney James H. Ferrick, III. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C. v. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Powers
Represented By: Nathan E. Ross
Represented By: Scott C. Matasar
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lesny
Represented By: David R. Bohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradigm Financial Advisors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Caroline Belle Paillou
Represented By: James H. Ferrick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?