Wisdom v. Saul
Plaintiff: Katohna D. Wisdom
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01837
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Katohna D. Wisdom. William Barr, Attorney General served on January 7, 2021. (MCB)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Katohna D. Wisdom. Andrew M. Saul served on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (JMP) Modified on 1/19/2021 (MCB).
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Andrew M. Saul, Plaintiff Katohna D. Wisdom. (KJS)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marshals Service. (JMP)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER -TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: his case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties shall have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/11/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/21/2020. (JMP)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/21/2020. (JMP)
December 21, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Katohna D. Wisdom. (BAK)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Katohna D. Wisdom. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kohl, Donald)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Katohna D. Wisdom. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons SSA, #4 Summons US Atty General, #5 Summons US Atty)(Kohl, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisdom v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katohna D. Wisdom
Represented By: Donald L. Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?