Johnson v. McDonalds Corporation et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA JOHNSON
Defendant: mcdonalds corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC and Tenaj, LC, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01867
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nigel F. Telman. (VERIFIED) The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8447277) by Defendants McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonalds Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Telman, Nigel) filed by McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonalds Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/3/2021. (NEP)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nigel F. Telman. (VERIFIED) The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8447277) by Defendants McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonalds Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Telman, Nigel)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward C. Young. (VERIFIED) The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8442216) by Defendants McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonalds Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Young, Edward) filed by McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonalds Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/2/2021. (NEP)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edward C. Young. (VERIFIED) The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8442216) by Defendants McDonald's USA, LLC, McDonalds Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Young, Edward)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 1/8/2021. (KEK)
December 28, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 3. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant mcdonalds corporation with receipt number AMOEDC-8364832, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by BARBARA JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #4 Attachment Corporate Interests)(Bruner-Wiltse, Claire) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2020: #5 Waiver of Service, #6 Waiver of Service) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. McDonalds Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mcdonalds corporation
Represented By: Edward C. Young
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's USA, LLC
Represented By: Edward C. Young
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenaj, LC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA JOHNSON
Represented By: Claire Ann Bruner-Wiltse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?