Brinkley v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michelle Brinkley
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2020cv01883
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General filed by Michelle Brinkley. (AFO)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chief Regional Counsel filed by Michelle Brinkley. (AFO)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Michelle Brinkley. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (AFO)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Michelle Brinkley, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (AFO)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
December 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marshals Service. (KJS)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (See order for full details.) (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/20/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/30/20. (KJS)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/30/20. (KJS)
December 30, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Michelle Brinkley. (MFG)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff MICHELLE BRINKLEY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit financial affidavit)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security Non-Jury Demand,, filed by MICHELLE BRINKLEY. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form original filing form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover, #3 Summons United States Attorney, #4 Summons United States Attorney General, #5 Summons Regional Chief Counsel)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinkley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Brinkley
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?