In re: Mark D. Murphy
Respondent: Mark D. Murphy
Case Number: 4:2020mc00900
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #2 Notice (Other),,, by Respondent Mark D. Murphy filed by Respondent Mark D. Murphy. (Murphy, Mark)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SHOW CAUSE ORDER - A copy of an order demonstrating the imposition of discipline upon Mark D. Murphy by the Supreme Court of Kansas has been filed with this Court. In accordance with Local Rule 12.02 and the Rules of Disciplinary Enforcement, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mark D. Murphy shall show cause in writing within thirty days after service of this order why the same discipline ordered by the Supreme Court of Kansas should not be imposed by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be sent by U.S. and UPS Signature Required to Respondent at Murphy Law Firm, 6640 West 143rd Street, Suite 250, Overland Park, Kansas 66223-3301. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/21/2020. Mailed U.S./UPS Signature Required on 12/22/2020 (BAS).
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 ATTORNEY DISCIPLINARY proceedings; Order from the Supreme Court State of Kansas and Suspension Notice as to Respondent Mark D. Murphy. (BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Mark D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?