Brumbaugh v. Saul
Plaintiff: Alexandria N. Brumbaugh
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00013
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General filed by Alexandria N. Brumbaugh. (KCD)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Alexandria N. Brumbaugh. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 1/14/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (KCD)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
January 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KCD)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: four [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS].. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/05/2021. (KCD)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/05/2021. (KCD)
January 5, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Alexandria N. Brumbaugh. (Camp, David)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alexandria N. Brumbaugh. (Camp, David)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Alexandria N. Brumbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Camp, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumbaugh v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria N. Brumbaugh
Represented By: David D. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?