Lobmaster v. Saul
Plaintiff: David Lobmaster
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00125
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by David Lobmaster. (Attachments: #1 Service to OGC, #2 Service to ATTY GEN)(Williams, Franklin)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by David Lobmaster. Defendant Andrew Saul served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Service to OGC, #2 Service to ATTY GEN)(Williams, Franklin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff David Lobmaster, Defendant Andrew Saul. (ANP)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/23/2021. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 02/02/2021. (ANP)
February 2, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Franklin Williams. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (JWD)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Andrew Saul with receipt number AMOEDC-8443240, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by David Lobmaster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons Office of Chief Counsel, #5 Summons United States Attorney)(Williams, Franklin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobmaster v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lobmaster
Represented By: Franklin A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?