Horan v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua Horan
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00147
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: #12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal ; SO ORDERED. Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/23/2021. (JMP)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joshua Horan (Pontello, Dominic)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file dismissal papers on or before April 5, 2021. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of this case by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other remaining deadlines are stayed pending dismissal of this case. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 4/5/2021.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/4/2021. (JMP)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Joshua Horan (Pontello, Dominic)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Midland Credit Management, Inc. answer due 3/4/2021. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/8/2021. (AFO)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (McGivney, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas David O'Conner for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (O'Conner, Nicholas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (McGivney, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (McGivney, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Joshua Horan.(JWD)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Parent companies: Encore Capital Group, Inc.,. (McGivney, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Circuit, St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 20SL-AC24503, with receipt number AMOEDC-8452950, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (summons and complaint, request to appoint process server, proof of service, and a copy of the state courts docket sheet), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(McGivney, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael McGivney for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (McGivney, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horan v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Horan
Represented By: Dominic M. Pontello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas David O'Conner
Represented By: Michael McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?