Rosa v. MITEK INC.
Plaintiff: Jacob Rosa
Defendant: MITEK INC.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00187
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant MITEK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy O'Donnell)(Wientge, Joseph)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant MITEK INC.. (Wientge, Joseph)
April 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant MITEK INC.. (Wientge, Joseph)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/27/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/10/2021 02:15 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 03/29/2021. (ANP)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant MITEK INC. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wientge, Joseph)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by MITEK INC..(Wientge, Joseph)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant MITEK INC.. Parent companies: MiTek Holdings, Inc., which is owned by MiTek Industries, Inc., which is owned by Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.,. (Wientge, Joseph)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Jacob Rosa.(BAK)
February 16, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant MITEK INC. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Wientge, Joseph)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin R. Marble for Defendant MITEK INC.. (Marble, Benjamin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph M. Wientge, Jr for Defendant MITEK INC.. (Wientge, Joseph)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 20SL-CC06198, with receipt number AMOEDC-8472483, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by MITEK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal, #3 Criminal Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Wientge, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosa v. MITEK INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MITEK INC.
Represented By: Benjamin R. Marble
Represented By: Joseph M. Wientge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Rosa
Represented By: David O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?