Hendrickson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Austin James Shanor Hendrickson
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00224
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed SSA served on 3/2/2021 filed by Austin James Shanor Hendrickson. (LNJ)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed US Attorney General served on 3/5/2021 filed by Austin James Shanor Hendrickson. (LNJ)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Austin James Shanor Hendrickson. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 2/25/2021 upon US Attorney, answer due 4/26/2021. (LNJ)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (CLO) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/24/2021) (CLO).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and orders the Clerk to issue process or cause process to issue on the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/23/2021. (CLO)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order - Track 4: Social Security Appeal: Pursuant to the Local Rules and the Differentiated Case Management Program of the United States District Court of the Eastern District of Missouri, the Court orders that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 2/23/2021. (CLO)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO) (CLO).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4, 5, 6. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Tue Feb 23 16:00:52 CST 2021 (Olliges, Chelsea)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Tue Feb 23 09:55:16 CST 2021 (Olliges, Chelsea)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Austin James Shanor Hendrickson. (JKL)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand, filed by Austin James Shanor Hendrickson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Envelope)(JKL)
February 22, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JKL)
February 22, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Feb 22 17:00:36 CST 2021 (admin,)
February 22, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin James Shanor Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?