United States of America v. Dembo
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Elizabeth Dembo
Case Number: 4:2021cv00230
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3731
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America Elizabeth Dembo waiver signed on 2/23/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Sestric, Amy)
February 24, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued: 1. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Elizabeth Dembo in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patient J.D., #2 Exhibit 2 - Patient M.R., #3 Exhibit 3 - Patient T.K., #4 Exhibit 4 - Patient S.T., #5 Exhibit 5 - Patient E.H., #6 Exhibit 6 - Patient H.L., #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form, #9 Waiver of Service, #10 Waiver of Service)(Sestric, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dembo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Dembo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Amy E. Sestric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?