Williams v. Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America
Plaintiff: Brenata A. Williams
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America and Charles Rettig
Case Number: 4:2021cv00335
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Department of Treasury filed by Brenata A. Williams. (CLO)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General filed by Brenata A. Williams. (CLO)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Brenata A. Williams. Defendant Charles Rettig (US Attorney) served on 3/19/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (LNJ)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Charles Rettig, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (LNJ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/19/2021) (LNJ).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/18/2021. (LNJ)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brenata A. Williams. (JKL)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Internal Revenue Service Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Brenata A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Form Application to Proceed without Paying Fees or Costs)(Hall, Steven)
March 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenata A. Williams
Represented By: Steven D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?