In the Matter of Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC
Plaintiff: Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC
Claimant: Amanda Castloo
Case Number: 4:2021cv00337
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 0181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Roy C. Dripps for Claimant Amanda Castloo. (Dripps, Roy)
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Lift Stay / Dissolve Injunction by Claimant Amanda Castloo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Claimant's Stipulation in Support of Motion to Dissolve Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order on Motion to Dissolve Injunction)(Walton, Troy)
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 CLAIM for Maritime Wrongful Death filed by Claimant Amanda Castloo filed by Claimant Amanda Castloo. (Walton, Troy)
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Troy E. Walton for Claimant Amanda Castloo. (Walton, Troy)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Amanda Castloo.(Walton, Troy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE Proof of Publication: by Plaintiff Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of publication)(Settergren, Neal)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY. See notice for full details. (ANP)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ENTERING RULE F INJUNCTION, APPROVING LETTER OF UNDERTAKING, AND DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE. See order for full details. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 03/31/2021. (ANP)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits Pursuant to Rule F by In Re Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice)(Howard, Giles)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE Letter of Undertaking: by In Re Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC (Howard, Giles)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by In Re Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC.. (Howard, Giles)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 3/28/2021. (KEK)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Douglas E. Gossow for In Re Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC. (Gossow, Douglas)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Neal W. Settergren for Plaintiff Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC. (Settergren, Neal)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-8536396, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Howard, Giles)
March 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway Dredging and Contracting LLC
Represented By: Giles Benjamin Howard
Represented By: Douglas E. Gossow
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Amanda Castloo
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Roy C. Dripps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?