Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC v. Avera Health Plans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC doing business as NFP Rx Solutions
Defendant: Avera Health Plans, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00400
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Referring Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Avera Health Plans, Inc. Amendment to #1 Complaint, , filed by Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC.(Schultz, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONCERNING JURISDICTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by May 31, 2021, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on May 24, 2021. (BRP)
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (KXS)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Avera Health Plans, Inc.. Parent companies: Avera Health Plans, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Schwartz, Steven)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Avera Health Plans, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 5/17/2021. (CBL)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Avera Health Plans, Inc.. (Schwartz, Steven) filed by Avera Health Plans, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Avera Health Plans, Inc. answer due 5/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on May 7, 2021. (MCB)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Avera Health Plans, Inc.. (Schwartz, Steven)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Avera Health Plans, Inc.. (Schwartz, Steven)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC. Avera Health Plans, Inc. served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Kennedy, Angela)
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC Process Server: Allegiance Investigators (Kennedy, Angela)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Angela B. Kennedy for Plaintiff Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC. (Kennedy, Angela)
April 5, 2021 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (CBL)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC Process Server: HPS Process Service and Investigations (JKL)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff VALUED PHARMACY SERVICES OF THE MIDWEST, LLC D/B/A NFP RX SOLUTIONS. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant AVERA HEALTH PLANS, INC. with receipt number AMOEDC-8570359, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by VALUED PHARMACY SERVICES OF THE MIDWEST, LLC D/B/A NFP RX SOLUTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Customer Letter, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, #5 Summons)(Schultz, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Jeffrey L. Schultz. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC v. Avera Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avera Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Steven H. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valued Pharmacy Services of the Midwest, LLC doing business as NFP Rx Solutions
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Schultz
Represented By: Angela B. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?