Nunemacher v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brendan A. Nunemacher
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv00427
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Brendan A. Nunemacher, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (AFO)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General filed by Brendan A. Nunemacher. (KJS)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of SSA filed by Brendan A. Nunemacher. (JMP)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Brendan A. Nunemacher. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 4/15/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (KJS)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan Konoski. ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 04/15/2021. (SMB)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties shall have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. (See order for complete details.) (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 5/5/2021.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 4/13/21. (KJS)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 4/13/21. (KJS)
April 13, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marshals Service. (KJS)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bryan Konoski. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8585510) by Plaintiff Brendan A Nunemacher. (Konoski, Bryan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brendan A Nunemacher. (Konoski, Bryan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT against defendant Andrew M. Saul, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Brendan A Nunemacher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Social Security Admin, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons Attorney General, #5 Motion for pro hac vice admission)(Konoski, Bryan) Modified on 4/13/2021 (JWD). [Attorney filing errors: filing attorney attached motion to appear pro hac vice as Attachment #5. Attorney has re-filed motion to appear pro hac vice as docket entry #3 . Docket text corrected to reflect that this is a Social Security Complaint as filer used the event "Complaint" instead of the event "Complaint (Social Security)." NEF regenerated to parties.]
April 13, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunemacher v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan A. Nunemacher
Represented By: Bryan Konoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?