Tropic Island Cruises, Inc. v. Skipperliner Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tropic Island Cruises, Inc.
Defendant: Skipperliner Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00545
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Tropic Island Cruises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levchinsky, Stanislav)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Plaintiff Tropic Island Cruises, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Skipperliner Industries, Inc. [ECF No. #6 ] is GRANTED and the default of said defendant is hereby entered. (JMP)
July 1, 2021 ***REMARK Mailed a copy of the Clerks Entry of Default #7 to Skipperliner Industries, Inc.,201 Main Street, Suite 700 La Crosse, WI 54601 on this day. (JMP)
June 29, 2021 ***REMARK - Sent a copy of the Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default (doc #6 ) to the Exec_Team email box this day. (JMP)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant, Skipperliner Industries, Inc. by Plaintiff Tropic Island Cruises, Inc.. (Levchinsky, Stanislav)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Tropic Island Cruises, Inc.. Skipperliner Industries, Inc. served on 5/10/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Levchinsky, Stanislav)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Tropic Island Cruises, Inc... (Levchinsky, Stanislav)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Tropic Island Cruises, Inc. Process Server: Advanced Private Investigations, Inc. (Levchinsky, Stanislav)
May 10, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Stanislav Levchinsky. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. (JKL)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Skipperliner Industries, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-8633884, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Tropic Island Cruises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Record from Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions, #2 Exhibit 2 - corporate record summary from Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions, #3 Exhibit 3 - General Index of Abstract Title, #4 Exhibit 4 - General Index of Abstract Title Continuation Sheet No. 1, #5 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #6 Summons summons)(Levchinsky, Stanislav) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2021: #7 Original Filing Form) (JKL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tropic Island Cruises, Inc. v. Skipperliner Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skipperliner Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tropic Island Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Stanislav Levchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?