McFarland v. St. Louis County Family Court Division
Plaintiff: Johnathan McFarland
Defendant: St. Louis County Family Court Division
Case Number: 4:2021cv00554
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED EXHIBIT re #6 Memorandum by Plaintiff Johnathan McFarland. (ARL)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Plaintiff Johnathan McFarland. (ARL)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Johnathan McFarland. (NEP)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Johnathan McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(NEP)
May 12, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed May 12 11:01:08 CDT 2021 (admin,)
May 12, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
May 12, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Johnathan McFarland. (BAK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Johnathan McFarland. (BAK)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant St. Louis County Family Court Division Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Johnathan McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. St. Louis County Family Court Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Family Court Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?