Wilson v. First Student, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Wilson
Defendant: First Student Management, LLC, First Student Transportation, LLC, First Student Services, LLC, Lucas Terando, John Doe Corporation and First Student, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00608
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Referring Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants First Student Services, LLC, First Student Transportation, LLC, John Doe Corporation. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf).(Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/22/2021.) (TMT)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: two Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/5/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/12/2021 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 07/13/2021. (KCD)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference set for July 13, 2021 is CANCELED. The Rule 16 Conference will be rescheduled at a later date. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 14, 2021. (JAU)
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (KXS)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by First Student Management, LLC, First Student, Inc., Lucas Terando.(Znosko, Jennifer)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants First Student Management, LLC, First Student, Inc., Lucas Terando Sent To: State Court - Executed (Znosko, Jennifer)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/6/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/13/2021 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 5/28/21. (EAB)
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, filed by Aaron Wilson.(JKL)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant First Student Management, LLC.. (Znosko, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant First Student, Inc.. Parent companies: FirstGroup America Holdings, Inc.; Laidlaw Transportation, Inc.; FirstGroup PLC,. (Znosko, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants First Student Management, LLC, First Student, Inc., Lucas Terando Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment File Stamped Notice of Removal)(Znosko, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie C. Cohan for Defendants First Student Management, LLC, First Student, Inc., Lucas Terando. (Cohan, Stephanie)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer C. Znosko for Defendants First Student Management, LLC, First Student, Inc., Lucas Terando. (Znosko, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2122-CC00758, with receipt number AMOEDC-8667777, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by First Student Management, LLC, Lucas Terando, First Student, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Znosko, Jennifer)
May 27, 2021 Judge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (CBL)
May 27, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. First Student, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student Management, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer C. Znosko
Represented By: Stephanie C. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Terando
Represented By: Jennifer C. Znosko
Represented By: Stephanie C. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer C. Znosko
Represented By: Stephanie C. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Wilson
Represented By: Debbie S. Champion
Represented By: Dean A. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?