Huskey v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Drew Huskey
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever
Case Number: 4:2021cv00710
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Referring Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Conopco, Inc..(Muehlberger, James)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Before the Court are two motions to transfer and coordinate pretrial proceedings. Docs. 35 , 37 . The Court previously granted a motion to consolidate eight cases with identical claims against Defendant Conopco, Inc. Doc. 13 . Since that order, Defendant has removed five cases filed by the same lawyer raising the same claims on behalf of new plaintiffs. Defendant requests, with consent of Plaintiffs counsel, that these actions be consolidated for pretrial purposes:1. Fischer v. Conopco, Inc., 4:21-cv-00582-JMB2. Muller v. Conopco, Inc., 4:21-cv-00583-SRW3. Sandbach v. Conopco, Inc., 4:21-cv-00706-DDN4. Sandbach v. Conopco, Inc., 4:21-cv-00709-JAR5. Huskey v. Conopco, Inc., 4:21-cv-00710-SRWFor the reasons articulated in the previous order to consolidate, Doc. 13 , the Court will grant the motions. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions to transfer and coordinate pretrial proceedings, Docs. 35 , 37 , are GRANTED. All pleading and other documents in this matter shall be filed in Crepps v. Conopco, Inc., 4:19-cv-02554-SEP. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.03.(ARL)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Defendant Conopco, Inc. of Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Motion to Transfer and Memorandum in Support)(Muehlberger, James)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time #7 is GRANTED. Defendant Conopco, Inc. must file a responsive pleading no later than July 8, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 06/23/21. (MCC)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Drew Huskey.(JKL)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Confirmation)(Muehlberger, James)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. Parent companies: Conopco, Inc., d/b/a "Unilever" states that it is wholly owned by Unilever United States, Inc., Subsidiaries: Unilever Trumbull Research Services, Inc., Ben & Jerry's Homemade, Inc., Sundial Brands, LLC., Publicly held company: Unilever United States, Inc. is owned, indirectly, by Unilever PLC, which is publicly traded. Unilever PLC does not have parent corporation.,. (Muehlberger, James)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Muehlberger, James)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with receipt number AMOEDC-8707081, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Compliant, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muehlberger, James)
June 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huskey v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever
Represented By: James Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Huskey
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?