Tacina v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Tacina
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service and United States Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 4:2021cv00711
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Treasury. (Cohen, Priyanka)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Treasury, Plaintiff Jeff Tacina. (BRP)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Jeff Tacina re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/19/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction) (TMT)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mon Jul 12 14:48:32 CDT 2021 (Tillman, Tiffani)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #6 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before August 16, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 6/22/2021. (KBL)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7. Sent to non-electronic party this date. Tue Jun 22 10:04:15 CDT 2021 (Porter, Brittany)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Treasury. (Cohen, Priyanka)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Treasury Sent To: Plaintiff (Cohen, Priyanka)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Treasury Sent To: State Court - Executed (Cohen, Priyanka)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Jeff Tacina.(BAK)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, case number 21SL-SC00223, Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form , #3 Notice to State Court, #4 Exhibit A- Copy of the Complete State Court filing)(Cohen, Priyanka)
June 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacina v. Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Priyanka Dhirajlal Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Priyanka Dhirajlal Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Tacina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?