Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2021cv00737
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Fischer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8818470) by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fischer, David) filed by Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries ; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on August 19, 2021. (MCB)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Fischer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8818470) by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fischer, David)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice S. Starling Marshall by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/4/21. (EAB)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice S. Starling Marshall. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8790991) by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marshall, Sarah)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David B. Blair by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/2/21. (EAB)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dwight N. Mersereau by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/2/21. (EAB)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David B. Blair. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8785759) by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Blair, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dwight N. Mersereau. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8785521) by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mersereau, Dwight)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (KXS)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries.. (Potts, Jonathan)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM re #1 Complaint, Summons - U.S. Attorney by Plaintiff Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Summons Internal Revenue Service, #2 Summons Attorney General)(Potts, Jonathan)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with receipt number AMOEDC-8714457, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Potts, Jonathan)
June 22, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Jonathan B. Potts. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Express Scripts, Inc. and Subsidiaries
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Represented By: David Blair
Represented By: David J. Fischer
Represented By: Dwight Mersereau
Represented By: Sarah Starling Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?