Beck v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Beck
Defendant: Corteva, Inc., Cargill Incorporated, BASF Corporation, CHS Inc., Growmark Inc., Tenkoz Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Bayer CropScience L.P., Bayer CropScience Inc, Syngenta Corporation, Growmark FS, LLC and Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00749
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Mary Fee terminated.Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/20/21. (ARL)
August 13, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
June 24, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO)
June 23, 2021 Filing 52 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00996. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO)
June 22, 2021 Filing 51 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk.(MMP)
May 10, 2021 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Beck. BASF Corporation served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Bayer Cropscience LP served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Bayer Cropscience, Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; CHS Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Cargill Incorporated served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Corteva, Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Federated Co-Operatives LTD served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Growmark FS, LLC served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Growmark Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Nutrien AG Solutions Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Syngenta Corporation served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Tenkoz, Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Univar Solutions, Inc. served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Winfield Solutions, LLC served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Cashman, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 49 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-DIRECTED TO REFILE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Beck re #1 Complaint, Summons (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service by Email)(Cashman, Michael) Modified text on 5/10/2021 (lmb).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lara Bach for BASF Corporation.; granting #42 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Lender for BASF Corporation.; granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam C. Hemlock for BASF Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK)
May 5, 2021 Filing 46 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Dufresne on behalf of Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.. (Dufresne, Andrew)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: All proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned cases are STAYED until ten days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer these actions to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. See In re Crop Inputs Antitrust Litig., MDL No. 2993. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/5/2021.Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL et al.(GRR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam Hemlock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729548 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Lender. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729528 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lara Bach. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729483 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 5, 2021 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.. (Westerman, Luke)
May 5, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Westerman on behalf of Nutrien AG Solutions Inc.. (Westerman, Luke)
May 5, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathy L. Osborn. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8728942 filed by CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
May 5, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Schwingler on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Schwingler, Peter)
May 5, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Woodruff on behalf of Univar Solutions, Inc.. (Woodruff, Jon)
May 5, 2021 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Syngenta Corporation. (Long, James) Modified text on 5/6/2021 (CLK).
May 4, 2021 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant BASF Corporation. (Wind, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A Wind on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Wind, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Fee on behalf of BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary)
May 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jevon Bindman on behalf of Syngenta Corporation. (Bindman, Jevon)
May 3, 2021 Filing 30 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kenneth Beck Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Letter to Judge #24 . (Regan, Anne)
April 30, 2021 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 Stipulation. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 30, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION re Pretrial Order No. 1 by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. Jointly Signed by All parties. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER in Response to (47 in 0:21-cv-00543-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (25 in 0:21-cv-00970-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (24 in 0:21-cv-00996-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (40 in 0:21-cv-00681-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (40 in 0:21-cv-00719-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (63 in 0:21-cv-00433-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (92 in 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (45 in 0:21-cv-00404-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (41 in 0:21-cv-00685-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (58 in 0:21-cv-00475-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (48 in 0:21-cv-00462-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge, (44 in 0:21-cv-00639-MJD-TNL) Letter to District Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs may file a letter response to Defendants' letter by Monday, May 2, 2021. 2. If the parties are unable to agree on the scheduling or procedure governing the anticipated omnibus motion to transfer and the status of the pending individual motions to transfer venue, the parties shall direct those disagreements to Magistrate Judge Leung for a ruling. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/30/2021.Associated Cases: 0:21-cv-00351-MJD-TNL et al.(GRR)
April 29, 2021 Filing 26 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Federated Co-Operatives LTD. (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 29, 2021 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Tenkoz, Inc.. (Hashmall, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc. Regarding Venue Motions. (Jensen, Richard)
April 28, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Hashmall on behalf of Tenkoz, Inc.. (Hashmall, David)
April 28, 2021 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan)
April 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C Miesen on behalf of Winfield Solutions, LLC. (Miesen, Jonathan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Davida Sheri McGhee on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (McGhee, Davida)
April 27, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Cargill Incorporated. (Zhao, X.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by X. Kevin Zhao on behalf of Cargill Incorporated. (Zhao, X.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Corteva, Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla)
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M Vehrs on behalf of Corteva, Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Chow on behalf of CHS Inc.. (Chow, Emily)
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Kenneth Beck. No summons requested. (Cashman, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion. See Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/20/2021. (EB)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-996 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/20/2021.(MMP)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION TO SET RESPONSE DEADLINES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Stilson, Jaime)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Drew R. Ball for Kenneth Beck; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steve McCann for Kenneth Beck. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/19/2021. (NAH)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Tenkoz, Inc. (MTP)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives LTD, Syngenta Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MTP)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-00996 PJS/KMM. (MTP)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives LTD. (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steve E. McCann. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8684723 filed by Kenneth Beck. (Cashman, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Drew R. Ball. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8684697 filed by Kenneth Beck. (Cashman, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8684327) filed by Kenneth Beck. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) (Cashman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Karla M Vehrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Incorporated
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Represented By: Davida Sheri McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Mary Fee
Represented By: Lara Bach
Represented By: Todd A Wind
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Adam C. Hemlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Kathy Osborn
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Chow
Represented By: Kathy L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Stilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenkoz Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: David L Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Luke Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Dufresne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jon M. Woodruff
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winfield Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan C Miesen
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Miesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience L.P.
Represented By: Richard G Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc
Represented By: Richard G Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: James J. Long
Represented By: Jevon Bindman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growmark FS, LLC
Represented By: Jaime Stilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Beck
Represented By: Steve McCann
Represented By: Nathan D Prosser
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Drew R. Ball
Represented By: Michael R Cashman
Represented By: Anne T. Regan
Represented By: Michael R. Cashman
Represented By: Nathan D. Prosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?