Young v. Mayor of the City of Saint Louis et al
Plaintiff: Keith Young
Defendant: St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department, Kent Flake, Jamie Wilson, Mayor of the City of St. Louis, Mayor of the City of Saint Louis and St. Louis Police Department
Case Number: 4:2021cv00776
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOVANT'S ANSWER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER re #12 , MOVANT'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Keith Young. (ANP)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Keith Young shall show cause as to why he has not responded to Defendants Mayor of the City of St. Louis, Kent Flake, Jamie Wilson, and St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department's Motion to Dismiss, and include any response to the Motion to Dismiss, no later than August 25, 2021. Failure to do so will result in the Court ruling on Defendants Mayor of the City of City of St. Louis, Kent Flake, Jamie Wilson, and St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department's unopposed Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #7 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to Keith Young, 5449 Claxton, St. Louis, MO 63120. (Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2021.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/11/2021. (Order sent to plaintiff via order receipt this date.)(CBL)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Order sent to party not electronically notified this date. Wed Aug 11 10:46:32 CDT 2021 (Long, Carol)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (ANP)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Thu Aug 5 15:59:52 CDT 2021 (Petri, Alexis)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand/Retransfer[sic] Case to the State of Missouri and to Deny Defendant's Motion for Removal to Federal Court and to Strik[sic] the Removal Motion as Being Untimely by Plaintiff Keith Young. (ANP)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is before the undersigned pursuant to Local Rule 2.08(A) of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Missouri. Pending is a motion to dismiss, which the Court cannot rule on without the full, written consent of the parties. Consequently, no later than July 30, 2021, each party must complete the electronic Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction indicating that they either consent to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge or opt to have the case assigned to a randomly-selected U.S. District Judge. Instructions for completing the required notice can be found on the Courts website at:http://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/documents/forms/moed-0063.pdf. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/30/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 07/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Notice) (ANP)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Wed Jul 21 12:06:08 CDT 2021 (Petri, Alexis)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Kent Flake, Mayor of the City of Saint Louis, St. Louis Police Department, Jamie Wilson. (Dierker, Catherine) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/7/2021) (ANP).
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Kent Flake, Mayor of the City of Saint Louis, St. Louis Police Department, Jamie Wilson. (Dierker, Catherine)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Kent Flake, Mayor of the City of Saint Louis, St. Louis Police Department, Jamie Wilson Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, Notice to State Court of Removal, #2 Exhibit Ex B, Proof of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court)(Dierker, Catherine)
June 29, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (JKL)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Keith Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Metropolitan PD Owner's Notification of Recovered Vehicle, #2 Exhibit City of St. Louis Dept of Streets)(JKL)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition,, Original Filing Form by Defendants Kent Flake, Mayor of the City of St. Louis, St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department, Jamie Wilson. (Dierker, Catherine)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Kent Flake, Mayor of the City of St. Louis, St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department, Jamie Wilson Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Removal)(Dierker, Catherine)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Missouri Circuit Court, case number 2122-CC00967, with receipt number AMOEDC-8725936, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department, Kent Flake, Mayor of the City of St. Louis, Jamie Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit State court File Ex A, #3 Exhibit State Court File Ex B, #4 Exhibit State Court File Ex C, #5 Exhibit State Court File Ex D, #6 Exhibit State Court File Ex. E, #7 Exhibit State Court File Ex F, #8 Exhibit State Court File Ex. G, #9 Exhibit State Court File Ex H, #10 Exhibit State Court File Ex I, #11 Exhibit Ex J - Docket sheets)(Dierker, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Mayor of the City of Saint Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Catherine Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Flake
Represented By: Catherine Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Wilson
Represented By: Catherine Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of the City of St. Louis
Represented By: Catherine Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor of the City of Saint Louis
Represented By: Catherine Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Police Department
Represented By: Catherine Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?