Fischer v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Fischer
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever
Case Number: 4:2021cv00782
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Conopco, Inc..(Muehlberger, James)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion to Transfer and Coordinate Pretrial Proceedings, Doc. 40 , is GRANTED. All pleading and other documents in the matters listed above shall be filed in Crepps v. Conopco, Inc., 4:19-cv-02554-SEP. See E.D. Mo. L.R. 4.03. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 07/15/2021. (ANP)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion to Transfer: by Defendant Conopco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer and Memorandum in Support)(Muehlberger, James) Modified on 7/14/2021 (MCB).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Conopco, Inc.; ORDERED ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JULY 20, 2021. Conopco, Inc. answer due 7/20/2021. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/1/21. (EAB)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Confirmation)(Muehlberger, James)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Peter Fischer.(JKL)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Muehlberger, James)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. Parent companies: Conopco, Inc., d/b/a "Unilever" states that it is wholly owned by Unilever United States, Inc., Subsidiaries: Unilever Trumbull Research Services, Inc. is owned by Conopco and by Ben &, Publicly held company: Unilever United States, Inc. is owned, indirectly, by Unilever PLC, which is publicly traded. Unilever PLC does not have parent corporations,. (Muehlberger, James)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form)(Muehlberger, James)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with receipt number AMOEDC-8728247, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Conopco, Inc..(Muehlberger, James) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/29/2021 to correct PDF error) (JKL).
June 29, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc. doing business as Unilever
Represented By: James Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Fischer
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?