Francis v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Francis
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc. doing business as Morrison Health Care
Case Number: 4:2021cv00823
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Referring Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss :Count II filed by Plaintiff Christine Francis. (Hackney, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss :Count II filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Williams, Erin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss :Count II by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Williams, Erin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Compass Group USA, Inc..(Williams, Erin)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants Defendant's #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. Answer/Response due August 12, 2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/28/2021. (LNJ)
July 27, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Williams, Erin)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Williams, Erin) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Compass Group USA, Inc. answer due 7/29/2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/14/21. (JAB)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Williams, Erin)
July 12, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL): Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings (ANP)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Williams, Erin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Christine Francis.(BAK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Mallory Stumpf Zoia for Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Zoia, Mallory)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Erin E. Williams for Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Williams, Erin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc... (Williams, Erin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Williams, Erin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 22nd Judicial Circuit of Missouri City of St. Louis, case number 2122-CC00971, with receipt number AMOEDC-8744765, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lynn Macenko, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Williams, Erin)
July 8, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Francis
Represented By: Jeffrey David Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc. doing business as Morrison Health Care
Represented By: Erin E. Williams
Represented By: Mallory Stumpf Zoia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?