Larose v. Vandergriff
Petitioner: Aaron Jason Larose
Respondent: David Vandergriff
Case Number: 4:2021cv00928
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Referring Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Quash the Respondent's Motion to Seal or in the Alternative to Strike Petition by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (ARL)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Respondent David Vandergriff filed by Respondent David Vandergriff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit Exhibit H-1, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H-2, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Kweskin, Benjamin)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondent David Vandergriff's motion to seal or strike Petitioner Aaron Jason LaRose's complaint and exhibits #15 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/9/2021. (KEK)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Aaron Jason LaRose's second motion to appoint counsel #14 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/9/2021. (KEK)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 16, 17. Thu Sep 9 11:22:01 CDT 2021 (Kratzer, Katie)
September 7, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative to Seal by Respondent David Vandergriff. (Kweskin, Benjamin)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Affidavit in Support by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(ANP)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. (KXS)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 13. Mon Aug 16 17:05:12 CDT 2021 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Jared Kweskin for Respondent David Vandergriff. (Kweskin, Benjamin)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order) This case is assigned to Track: 4. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/3/21. (EAB)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's Motion for an Evidence [sic] Hearing for Petitioners 2254 and Affidavit in Support (ECF No. #4 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's Motion for Discovery and Affidavit in Support (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Affidavit in Support (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/3/21. (EAB)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's duplicative motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. [7)] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 8/3/21. (EAB)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9, 10, 11. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Tue Aug 3 14:39:28 CDT 2021 (Brown, Erica)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
July 27, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MRC)
July 27, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (MRC)
July 27, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jul 27 17:08:58 CDT 2021 (admin,)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope) (MRC)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Affidavit In Support by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (MRC)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery and Affidavit In Support by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (MRC)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for An Evidence Hearing For Petitioner's 2254 and Affidavit In Support by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (MRC)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (MRC)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 EXHIBITS To Petition Part 1 of 6 re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Petition - Part 2 of 6, #2 Exhibits to Petition - Part 3 of 6, #3 Exhibits to Petition - Part 4 of 6, #4 Exhibits to Petition - Part 5 of 6, #5 Exhibits to Petition - Part 6 of 6) (MRC)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Aaron Jason Larose. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Label, #2 Cover Letter and Certificate of Service)(MRC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larose v. Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron Jason Larose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Vandergriff
Represented By: Office of Missouri Attorney General - Habeas Division
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Kweskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?