Miller v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jami Miller
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00971
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case is assigned to Track: 2. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Motion to Join Parties due by 12/10/2021. Discovery Completion due by 4/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2022. Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2022 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/17/21. (JAB)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Jami Miller. . (Bressler, Isaac)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Isaac Joseph Bressler for Plaintiff Jami Miller. (Bressler, Isaac)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all counsel in this matter shall be familiar with the Courts Local Rules, and shall read the Administrative Procedures for Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF), and the undersigneds Requirements and Federal Practice Tips at www.moed.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Upon review of the joint proposed scheduling plan described in paragraph 3 below, the Court will consider whether a Scheduling Conference is necessary or advisable prior to the issuance of a Case Management Order. If counsel believe that a conference would be beneficial to the parties, they shall so notify the Court and one will be promptly set. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan: No later than September 16, 2021, counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court a joint proposed scheduling plan. All dates required to be set forth in the plan shall be within the ranges set forth below for the applicable track:(See Full Order.) (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/16/2021.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/16/2021. (CBL)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings. (KXS)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc..(Dickinson, Joshua)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Jami Miller.(BAK)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Parent companies: Encore Capital Group, Inc., Publicly held company: Encore Capital Group, Inc.,. (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis Circuit Court, case number 2122-AC06379, with receipt number AMOEDC-8795702, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua)
August 5, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami Miller
Represented By: Dominic M. Pontello
Represented By: Isaac Joseph Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?