Cissell v. Penn National Gaming, Inc.
Plaintiff: Katrina Cissell
Defendant: Penn National Gaming, Inc. doing business as Hollywood Casino St. Louis
Case Number: 4:2021cv01023
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss and dismisses with prejudice Count III of Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/13/2021. (LNJ)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case and Show Cause Order filed by Plaintiff Katrina Cissell. (Wendler, Brian)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: No later than October 6, 2021, Plaintiff must show cause, in writing, why this Court should not grant #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Show Cause Response due by 10/6/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/29/2021. (LNJ)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Penn National Gaming, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Maule, Stephen)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Penn National Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination)(Maule, Stephen)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Penn National Gaming, Inc.. (Maule, Stephen)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Penn National Gaming, Inc..(Maule, Stephen)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John J. Marino, Jr for Defendant Penn National Gaming, Inc.. (Marino, John)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen B. Maule for Defendant Penn National Gaming, Inc.. (Maule, Stephen)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Katrina Cissell. Penn National Gaming, Inc. served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (Zinzilieta, Angie)
August 24, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Katrina Cissell Process Server: Pro Serve, LLC (Zinzilieta, Angie)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Penn National Gaming, Inc., d/b/a Hollywood Casino St. Louis with receipt number AMOEDC-8816492, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Katrina Cissell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form , #4 Summons Penn National Gaming, Inc.)(Zinzilieta, Angie)
August 17, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Angie Marie Zinzilieta. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cissell v. Penn National Gaming, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Cissell
Represented By: Angie Marie Zinzilieta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn National Gaming, Inc. doing business as Hollywood Casino St. Louis
Represented By: John J. Marino, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B. Maule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?