Giese et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Lynn Giese, Angela Trentmann and Susan Vogeler
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01064
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to close this case in light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Doc. #20 , and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 9/2/2021. (BRP)
September 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Victoria Lynn Giese, Angela Trentmann, Susan Vogeler (Snidow, John)
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp: Status Conference held on 8/27/2021. (proceedings started: 2:00 p.m.) (proceedings ended: 2:13 p.m.) (Appearance for Plaintiff: John Snidow & Alexandra Walsh)(Appearance for Defendant: Jessica Lauria, Jessica Miller, Mark Hegarty, & Beth Bauer) (KEK)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica C. Lauria and #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica D. Miller by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. ORDERED: GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/27/2021. (CBL)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark C. Hegarty for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Hegarty, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica C. Lauria. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8835789) by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate)(Lauria, Jessica)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica D. Miller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8835761) by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing for J. Miller)(Miller, Jessica)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J.J. Snidow and #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexandra Walsh by Plaintiffs Victoria Lynn Giese, Angela Trentmann, Susan Vogeler. ORDERED: GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 8/27/2021. (CBL)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an attorney-only Status Conference will be held in this matter on Friday, August 27, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. local time via Zoom. The Clerk of Court will provide login information to case participants. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. (Status Conference set for 8/27/2021 02:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on August 27, 2021. (BRP)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE Requesting a Hearing for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: by Plaintiffs Victoria Lynn Giese, Angela Trentmann, Susan Vogeler (Blair, William)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexandra Walsh. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8833705) by Plaintiffs Victoria Lynn Giese, Angela Trentmann, Susan Vogeler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Walsh, Alexandra)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice J.J. Snidow. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8833121) by Plaintiffs Victoria Lynn Giese, Angela Trentmann, Susan Vogeler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (DC))(Snidow, John)
August 26, 2021 ***REMARK: Plaintiff's counsel William Wylie Blair contacted by email on 8/26/2021 at 9:37 am and directed to file the required Notice Requesting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Counsel Blair's law firm staff contacted at 10:50 am by telephone and at 10:59 am and 1:38 pm by email and directed to file the required Notice. Notice Requesting Hearing on Motion for TRO not filed as of 2:15 on 8/26/2021. Case to proceed to judge assignment. (JWD)
August 26, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (JKL)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Victoria Lynn Giese, Angela Trentmann, Susan Vogeler. (JWD)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Victoria Lynn Giese, Susan Vogeler, Angela Trentmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37)(JWD)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Beth A. Bauer for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, State of MO, case number 2122-CC09111, with receipt number AMOEDC-8831742, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Kellett, Mary Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giese et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Lynn Giese
Represented By: Alexandra M. Walsh
Represented By: John James Snidow
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Trentmann
Represented By: Alexandra M. Walsh
Represented By: John James Snidow
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Vogeler
Represented By: Alexandra M. Walsh
Represented By: John James Snidow
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett
Represented By: Jessica Lauria
Represented By: Mark C. Hegarty
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Jessica Lauria
Represented By: Mark C. Hegarty
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?