Post v. Sher & Shabsin, P.C.
Plaintiff: Andrew Post
Defendant: Sher & Shabsin, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01113
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action Or, Alternatively, Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Dimond, Susan)
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action Or, Alternatively, Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Andrew Post. (Attachments: #1 Plaiantiff's Responses to Defendant's Statement of Facts)(Frawley, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Statement of Uncontroverted Facts re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action Or, Alternatively, Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Andrew Post. (Frawley, Matthew) Modified text on 10/13/2021 (JAB).
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action Or, Alternatively, Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Dimond, Susan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action Or, Alternatively, Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Shabsin, #2 Declaration of Teresa Rammirez)(Dimond, Susan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action Or, Alternatively, Stay Proceedings by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Dimond, Susan)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: The Court notes that Matthew Frawley, counsel for Plaintiff Andrew Post, filed a motion to withdraw as counsel when this matter was in state court. See Doc. 1-1 at pg. 1. No later than September 23, 2021, Frawley must provide the basis for withdrawal and the details of whether and how he's complied with the Missouri Rules of Professional Conduct regarding withdrawal. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/16/2021. (CLO)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings ; ORDERED GRANTED. Sher & Shabsin, P.C. answer due 10/5/2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/16/2021. (CLO)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings ;Extension to file the following: Responsive Pleadings ;Proposed extension date October 5, 2021 by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Dimond, Susan)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Dimond, Susan)
September 14, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (CLO)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Andrew Post. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JWD)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C... (Dimond, Susan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C. Sent To: Plaintiff (Dimond, Susan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Dustin Leo Goldberger for Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Goldberger, Dustin)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan M. Dimond for Defendant Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Dimond, Susan)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2022-AC09640, with receipt number AMOEDC-8862336, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Sher & Shabsin, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dimond, Susan)
September 13, 2021 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post v. Sher & Shabsin, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Post
Represented By: Matthew J Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sher & Shabsin, P.C.
Represented By: Susan M. Dimond
Represented By: Dustin Leo Goldberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?