United States of America v. One Hundred Thousand Dollars in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Hundred Thousand Dollars in U.S. Currency and Renzo Villacorta
Case Number: 4:2021cv01124
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER: [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/12/2021. (cc: USMS)(TMT)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casey, Stephen)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph Wayne Flees, II for Defendant Renzo Villacorta. (Flees, Joseph)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE Verified Claim of Interest or Right: by Defendant Renzo Villacorta (Flees, Joseph)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Joseph Flees, Type of return Complaint and Notice. (KCD)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Usman Ahmad, Type of return Complaint and Notice. (KCD)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Renzo Villacorta, Type of return Complaint and Notice. (KCD)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed, party served: $100,000 US Currency, Type of return Complaint and Warrant (BRP)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $100,000.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Casey, Stephen)
September 15, 2021 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant One Hundred Thousand Dollars in U.S. Currency. (JWD)
September 15, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Hundred Thousand Dollars in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Hundred Thousand Dollars in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzo Villacorta
Represented By: Joseph Wayne Flees, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?