Lizama v. Michaels Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Abraham Lizama
Defendant: Michaels Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01133
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Cockroft, Andrew)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER: Re #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kristine Argentine by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/1/21. (EAB)
October 29, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kristine Argentine. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8947873) by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Argentine, Kristine)
October 27, 2021 Filing 23 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (AFO)
October 27, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Abraham Lizama, Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/3/2021. (KJS)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING PLEADING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the consent motion of defendant Michaels Stores, Inc., to stay responsive pleading deadline and to set briefing schedule on motion to remand (Doc. #21 ) is sustained, in that: 1. Defendant has 14 days after the Court rules on plaintiff's motion to remand (Doc. #19 ) in which to respond to plaintiffs complaint; 2. Defendant has until Monday, November 8, 2021, to respond to plaintiff's motion to remand; and 3. Plaintiff has until Wednesday, November 24, 2021, to reply to defendant's response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on plaintiff's motion to remand is set for Friday, December 10, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. This hearing will be conducted in person in the courtroom of the undersigned; however, counsel for either party may opt to participate by Zoom conferencing. (Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/26/2021. (AFO)
October 25, 2021 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Stay the Responsive Pleading Deadline and to Set a Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Cockroft, Andrew)
October 18, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Abraham Lizama. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
October 18, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Abraham Lizama. (Orlowsky, Daniel)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas E. Ahlering by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/12/2021. (SMB)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas E. Ahlering ;attorney/firm Thomas E. Ahlering by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ahlering, Thomas)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION to Stay and Extend (Unopposed) Responsive Pleading Deadline by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Thomas, Oliver) filed by Michaels Stores, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED in part. Defendant has until October 25, 2021 to file an answer or other responsive pleading. The motion is denied as to a stay of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 09/27/2021. (SMB)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #13 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Burns and Andrew R. Cockroft. ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 09/24/2021. (SMB)
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Burns. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8884730) by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Michael J. Burns CA Bar Cert of Good Standing)(Burns, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew R. Cockroft. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8884214) by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Cockroft, Andrew)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay and Extend (Unopposed) Responsive Pleading Deadline by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Thomas, Oliver)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas E. Ahlering. ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 09/22/2021. (SMB)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas E. Ahlering. Verified Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8879186) by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Ahlering, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Abraham Lizama.(JWD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reed, Winthrop)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward T. Pivin for Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Pivin, Edward)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Oliver H. Thomas for Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Thomas, Oliver)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Reed, Winthrop)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Reed, Winthrop)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Winthrop B. Reed, III for Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Reed, Winthrop)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 21SL-CC03638, with receipt number AMOEDC-8874501, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filing, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Reed, Winthrop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lizama v. Michaels Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Lizama
Represented By: Adam M. Goffstein
Represented By: Daniel John Orlowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michaels Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Edward T. Pivin
Represented By: Oliver H. Thomas
Represented By: Winthrop B. Reed, III
Represented By: Michael J. Burns
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Represented By: Andrew Cockroft
Represented By: Kristine Argentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?