The United States of America v. Olive Street Pharmacy et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: Olive Street Pharmacy and Irina Shlafshteyn
Case Number: 4:2021cv01165
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3731
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT DECREE OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED as follows: (See order for full details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 10/20/21. (KJS)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Olive Street Pharmacy, Irina Shlafshteyn, Plaintiff The United States of America. (AFO)
October 6, 2021 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Olive Street Pharmacy to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/13/2021. (KJS)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Consent Decree)(Sestric, Amy)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Olive Street Pharmacy Olive Street Pharmacy waiver signed on 9/28/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Holtshouser, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Edward Holtshouser for Defendant Olive Street Pharmacy. (Holtshouser, Steven)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Irina Shlafshteyn Irina Shlafshteyn waiver signed on 9/28/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Juengel, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel A. Juengel for Defendant Irina Shlafshteyn. (Juengel, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Settlement by The United States of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment Consent Decree)(Sestric, Amy)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Olive Street Pharmacy, Irina Shlafshteyn in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form, #9 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver, #10 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver, #11 Waiver of Service, #12 Waiver of Service)(Sestric, Amy)
September 28, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. 2 Waiver(s) of Service issued. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. Olive Street Pharmacy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Amy E. Sestric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Street Pharmacy
Represented By: Steven Edward Holtshouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irina Shlafshteyn
Represented By: Daniel A. Juengel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?