Doe v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv01167
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilke, Julia)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilke, Julia)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. Uber Technologies, Inc. answer due 10/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 10/6/21. (SGP)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Wilke, Julia)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Julia Elizabeth Wilke for Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Wilke, Julia)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Jane Doe.(BAK)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court docket sheet. (BAK)
September 29, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BAK)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Tranen, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Notice to State Court)(Tranen, Daniel)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 21SL-CC03456, with receipt number AMOEDC-8892361, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tranen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Sean M. Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Tranen
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?