Bridgeton Landfill, LLC et al v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bridgeton Landfill, LLC, Republic Services, Inc. and Allied Services L.L.C.
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01171
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall remand this matter to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri from which it was removed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 10/26/2021. (ANP)
October 26, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court by Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Morris, James)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: This case is before the undersigned pursuant to Local Rule 2.08(A) of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of Missouri. Pending is a motion to remand, which the Court cannot rule on without the full, written consent of the parties. Consequently, no later than October 29, 2021, any party that has not consented must complete the electronic Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction indicating that they either consent to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge or opt to have the case assigned to a randomly-selected United States District Judge. Instructions for completing the required notice can be found on the Court's website at http://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/documents/forms/moed-0041.pdf. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 10/21/2021. (KRZ)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs filing a motion for remand (ECF No. 13), the November 2, 2021, Rule 16 Conference is Vacated.Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 10/13/2021. (NDT)
October 13, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Republic Services, Inc... (Beck, William)
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Bridgeton Landfill, LLC.. (Beck, William)
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Allied Services L.L.C... (Beck, William)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by William Garland Beck for Plaintiffs Allied Services L.L.C., Bridgeton Landfill, LLC, Republic Services, Inc.. (Beck, William)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court filed by Plaintiffs Allied Services L.L.C., Bridgeton Landfill, LLC, Republic Services, Inc.. (Beck, William)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to St. Louis County Circuit Court by Plaintiffs Allied Services L.L.C., Bridgeton Landfill, LLC, Republic Services, Inc.. (Beck, William)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Richard J. Rogers' Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 11) is GRANTED.Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 10/12/2021. (NDT)
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard J. Rogers. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8912175) by Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rogers, Richard)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/25/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/2/2021 09:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 10/07/2021. (KRZ)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Benson, Harry)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Bridgeton Landfill, LLC, Allied Services L.L.C., Republic Services, Inc..(BAK)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Amended) filed by Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit File-Stamped Removal Petition & Exhibits)(Morris, James) Modified on 9/30/2021 (BAK).
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Harry L. Benson for Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Benson, Harry)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Morris, James)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Parent companies: Arch Insurance Company, Arch Reinsurance Company, Arch Capital Group, Ltd., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Arch Capital Group, Ltd.,. (Morris, James)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by James C. Morris for Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Morris, James)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 21SL-CC03964, with receipt number AMOEDC-8896298, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit Ex C - State Court File)(Morris, James)
September 30, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgeton Landfill, LLC et al v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgeton Landfill, LLC
Represented By: William Garland Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Garland Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Services L.L.C.
Represented By: William Garland Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: James C. Morris
Represented By: Harry L. Benson
Represented By: Richard J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?