Gould v. United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan M. Gould
Defendant: United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America and Douglas J. McCarron
Case Number: 4:2021cv01187
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America.(Blitz, Robert)
November 18, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 PRO SE MOTION filed by Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Blitz, Robert)
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Disqualify and Preserve Decarlo & Shanley, Attorneys's at Law: Specifically Attorney Brian F. Quinn. by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould. (KCD)
November 3, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 PRO SE MOTION OBJECTING TO EXTENSION OF TIME AND MOTION TO AMEND filed by Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Blitz, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 PRO SE MOTION For Expedited Hearing and Emergency Motion for Injunction or Stay filed by Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A1)(Blitz, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Robert Blitz and Aaron Sanders filed by Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Limbrick, Thomas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Brian F. Quinn's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (No. 19) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/2/21. (JEB)
November 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian F. Quinn. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8951946) by Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Brian F. Quinn)(Quinn, Brian)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 PRO SE MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 59 by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould. (TMT)
October 25, 2021 Filing 17 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION OR STAY by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould. (TMT)
October 25, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas H. Limbrick for Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Limbrick, Thomas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to DISQUALIFY and PRESERVE BLITZ, BARDGETT, & DEUTSCH,LC.; SPECIFICALLY, ATTORNEYS ROBERT D. BLITZ AND AARONSANDERS AS WITNESSES AT TRIAL by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould. (TMT)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION OBJECTING TO EXTENSION OF TIME by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould. (TMT)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 11) is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's pleadings no later than December 2, 2021. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/22/21. (JEB)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron W. Sanders for Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Sanders, Aaron)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Blitz, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert D. Blitz for Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Blitz, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Michelle Nasser for Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Nasser, Michelle)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by James B. Martin for Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Martin, James)
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by James G. Martin for Defendants Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. (Martin, James)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jonathan M. Gould. United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (TMT)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jonathan M. Gould. Douglas J. McCarron served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (TMT)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould. (TMT)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould Process Server: ABC Legal (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAK)
October 6, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant Douglas J. McCarron, United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America. The summons was hand delivered to Plaintiff Jonathan Gould. (BAK)
October 5, 2021 Receipt 4644096334 in the amount of $402.00 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Jonathan Gould (CCAM)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Emergency Injunction by Plaintiff Jonathan M. Gould. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence Letter to McCarron)(JKL)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Jonathan M. Gould. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(JKL)
October 5, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JKL)
October 5, 2021 ***REMARK Plaintiff provided Notice of Process Server and 2 summonses at front counter to be returned for filing upon completion. Summonses to be issued upon filing. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan M. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Brotherhood of Carpenters & Joiners of America
Represented By: Brian F. Quinn
Represented By: James G. Martin
Represented By: Robert D. Blitz
Represented By: Aaron W. Sanders
Represented By: James B. Martin
Represented By: Michelle Nasser
Represented By: Thomas H. Limbrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas J. McCarron
Represented By: Brian F. Quinn
Represented By: James G. Martin
Represented By: Robert D. Blitz
Represented By: Aaron W. Sanders
Represented By: James B. Martin
Represented By: Michelle Nasser
Represented By: Thomas H. Limbrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?