Martin-Vinerkar v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Mckenzie Martin-Vinerkar
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv01244
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (ECF No. 8) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file the Certified Administrative Record no later than February 15, 2022. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/16/21. (JEB)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis)(Llewellyn, Nicholas)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(3) and (4) and this Court's Administrative Order entered on September 10, 2021, within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint, defendant must file a motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or certified administrative record which will be deemed an answer (general denial) to plaintiff's complaint. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/19/2021. (TMT)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. #3 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/19/2021. (TMT)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Mckenzie Martin-Vinerkar. (JKL)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mckenzie Martin-Vinerkar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Mckenzie Martin-Vinerkar. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Mckenzie Martin-Vinerkar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
October 18, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin-Vinerkar v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mckenzie Martin-Vinerkar
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?