United States of America v. Mahoney et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James T. Mahoney, Missouri Department of Revenue, LCS Financial Services Corp., Beneficial Financial I Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC and St. Louis County, Missouri.
Case Number: 4:2021cv01245
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Beneficial Financial I Inc. served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Mokodean, Gregory)
December 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United States of America. James T. Mahoney served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Mokodean, Gregory)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Missouri Department of Revenue served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Mokodean, Gregory)
December 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. The summons was emailed to Gregory Mokodean. (KEK)
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff United States of America Process Server: Legal Advocate Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons proposed summons for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC)(Mokodean, Gregory)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #9 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendant LCS Financial Services Corp. only are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/6/2021. (KEK)
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America of Defendant LCS Financial Corp. (Mokodean, Gregory)
November 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc., LCS Financial Services Corp., James T. Mahoney, Missouri Department of Revenue. The summons was emailed to Gregory Louis Mokodean. (NEP)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff United States of America Process Server: Legal Advocate Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed summons for LCS Financial)(Mokodean, Gregory)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff United States of America Process Server: Legal Advocate Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed summons for Beneficial Financial I Inc.)(Mokodean, Gregory)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff United States of America Process Server: Legal Advocate Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed summons for Missouri Department of Revenue)(Mokodean, Gregory)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff United States of America Process Server: Legal Advocate Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed summons for James Mahoney)(Mokodean, Gregory)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America St. Louis County, Missouri. waiver signed on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Mokodean, Gregory)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Edward William Corrigan, I for Defendant St. Louis County, Missouri.. (Corrigan, Edward)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 10/29/2021. (KEK)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service, #4 Waiver of Service, #5 Waiver of Service, #6 Waiver of Service, #7 Waiver of Service, #8 Waiver of Service)(Mokodean, Gregory)
October 18, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. 6 Waiver(s) of Service issued. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mahoney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory Louis Mokodean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCS Financial Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Financial I Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County, Missouri.
Represented By: Edward William Corrigan, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?