Bowen v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Daniel Bryan Bowen
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2021cv01258
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFIED Social Security Transcript Notice of Filing by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi (Attachments: #1 Transcript 1, #2 Transcript 2, #3 Transcript 3, #4 Transcript 4, #5 Transcript 5, #6 Transcript 6, #7 Transcript 7, #8 Transcript 8, #9 Transcript 9, #10 Transcript 10, #11 Transcript 11, #12 Transcript 12, #13 Transcript 13, #14 Transcript 14, #15 Transcript 15, #16 Transcript 16, #17 Transcript 17, #18 Transcript 18, #19 Transcript 19, #20 Transcript 20, #21 Transcript 21, #22 Transcript 22, #23 Transcript 23, #24 Transcript 24, #25 Transcript 25, #26 Transcript 26, #27 Transcript 27, #28 Transcript 28, #29 Transcript 29, #30 Transcript 30, #31 Transcript 31, #32 Transcript 32, #33 Transcript 33, #34 Transcript 34, #35 Transcript 35, #36 Transcript 36, #37 Transcript37, #38 Transcript 38, #39 Transcript 39, #40 Transcript 40)(Rund, Jane)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Social Security Appeal). (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/1/2021. (LNJ)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Rund, Jane)
October 21, 2021 Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (LNJ)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Daniel Bryan Bowen. (Olinsky, Howard)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security with receipt number AMOEDC-8930191, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Daniel Bryan Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Olinsky, Howard)
October 20, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bryan Bowen
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?