Kern v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Kerrie Kern
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 4:2021cv01264
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 (Standard). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) (Motion to Join Parties due by 1/15/2022. Discovery Completion due by 8/15/2022. ADR Future Reference 5/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2022. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/29/2021. (LNJ)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. . (Myers, Kevin)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Gretchen Myers/ The Law Offices of Gretchen Myers, P.C. by Plaintiff Kerrie Kern. (Myers, Gretchen) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/8/21. (JAB)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Gretchen Myers/ The Law Offices of Gretchen Myers, P.C. by Plaintiff Kerrie Kern. (Myers, Gretchen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Theresa A. Appelbaum for Plaintiff Kerrie Kern. (Appelbaum, Theresa)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Upon review of the joint proposed scheduling plan described in paragraph 3 below, the Court will consider whether a Scheduling Conference is necessary or advisable prior to the issuance of a Case Management Order. If counsel believe that a conference would be beneficial to the parties, they shall so notify the Court and one will be promptly set. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/29/2021. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/27/21. (JAB)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Myers, Kevin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Myers, Kevin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Kerrie Kern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Safeco Policy)(JKL)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Myers, Kevin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Sent To: Plaintiff (Myers, Kevin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (Myers, Kevin)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 21SL-CC03953, with receipt number AMOEDC-8933514, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Myers, Kevin)
October 21, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JKL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kern v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerrie Kern
Represented By: Gretchen Myers
Represented By: Theresa A. Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Kevin E. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?