Girardeau et al v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Mark Girardeau and Rosemary Girardeau
Defendant: Jack Andrew Hobbs, David Stojkovic, Viktor Express Inc and USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange
Case Number: 4:2021cv01265
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion To Withdraw as Attorney, Doc. #23 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove the Entry of Appearance signed by Robert J. Buckley, Doc. 10 , from the docket. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/17/2021. (KCD)
December 17, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Viktor Express Inc.(KCD)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Viktor Express Inc.'s Consent Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time, Doc. #26 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket Defendant Viktor Express Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/17/2021. (KCD)
December 16, 2021 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Viktor Express Inc. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Zaffiri, Bradley)
December 16, 2021 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Defendant Viktor Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Viktor Express Answer to First Amended Complaint)(Zaffiri, Bradley)
December 16, 2021 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley M. Zaffiri for Defendant Viktor Express Inc. (Zaffiri, Bradley)
December 16, 2021 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Kathleen S. Hamilton for Defendant Viktor Express Inc. (Hamilton, Kathleen)
December 14, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION TO WITHDRAW ENTRY OF APPEARANCE 10 ; attorney/firm Robert J. Buckley by Defendant Jack Andrew Hobbs. (Bertels, Ryan) Modified on 12/17/2021 (TMT).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER Re: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Greg Smith filed by Rosemary Girardeau, Mark Girardeau; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/10/2021. (TMT)
December 10, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Greg Smith. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-9022449) by Plaintiffs Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Gregory)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant United Services Automobile Association's ("USAA") Motion for Extension, Doc. #19 , is GRANTED. Defendant USAA shall file its required response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by January 3, 2022. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 12/6/2021. (TMT)
December 2, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Document by Defendant USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange. (Wulff, Robert)
December 2, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Wulff for Defendant USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange. (Wulff, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 17 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant David Stojkovic. The summons was emailed to Attorney, Lawrence Holcomb. (TMT)
November 30, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by Plaintiffs Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. (Holcomb, Lawrence)
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. Viktor Express Inc served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (Holcomb, Lawrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Summons Issued) (TMT).
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Holcomb, Lawrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Summons Issued) (TMT).
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. Jack Andrew Hobbs served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Holcomb, Lawrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2021: #1 Summons Issued) (TMT).
November 29, 2021 ***REMARK Re: #12 - The use of an attorney's electronic filing login and password to file a pleading, motion, memorandum or other document constitutes the signature of that attorney on that document for all purposes, including Fed.R.Civ.P. 11. (This document will be accepted by the Court, but for future filings please see Local Rule 11-2.11 located on the court website.) (TMT)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 First Amended Complaint, by Jack Andrew Hobbs.(Bertels, Ryan) Modified on 11/29/2021 (TMT).
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan E. Bertels for Defendant Jack Andrew Hobbs. (Bertels, Ryan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 DOCUMENT DELETED PER DTO # 30 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan E. Bertels for Defendant Jack Andrew Hobbs. (Bertels, Ryan) Modified on 12/17/2021 (KCD).
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 11/20/2021.) (TMT)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange. The summons was emailed to Attorney, Lawrence Holcomb. (TMT)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau as to USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange. (Holcomb, Lawrence) Modified on 11/9/2021 (TMT).
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by Plaintiffs Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. (Holcomb, Lawrence)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. Amended Complaint. (Holcomb, Lawrence) Modified on 11/3/2021 (KCD).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint properly establishing this Court's subject matter jurisdiction by or on Friday, November 5, 2021. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 11/5/2021.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/22/2021. (KCD)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange, Viktor Express Inc. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). (Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 11/1/2021.) (TMT)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau Process Server: PM Legal (BAK)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Jack Andrew Hobbs, David Stojkovic, USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange, Viktor Express Inc with receipt number AMOEDC-8934147, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Mark Girardeau, Rosemary Girardeau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holcomb, Lawrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2021: #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (BAK).
October 21, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. 4 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Lawrence King Holcomb. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Girardeau et al v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Girardeau
Represented By: Lawrence King Holcomb
Represented By: Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Girardeau
Represented By: Lawrence King Holcomb
Represented By: Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Andrew Hobbs
Represented By: Ryan E. Bertels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stojkovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viktor Express Inc
Represented By: Kathleen S. Hamilton
Represented By: Bradley M. Zaffiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Reciprocal Interinsurance Exchange
Represented By: Robert J. Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?