GJB, L.L.C. v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: GJB, L.L.C.
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01267
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Motion to Join Parties due by 1/24/2022. Discovery Completion due by 8/22/2022. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/8/2022. ADR Future Reference 5/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2022. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10S - St. Louis before District Judge Ronnie L. White. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/14/2023. Motion in Limine due by 3/14/2023.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/10/2021. (TMT)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 Telephone Conference previously scheduled for December 16, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., is CANCELED. The Court will issue a case management order based upon the parties Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/9/21. (JEB)
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. (Howell, Jennifer)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Katie E. St. John for Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (St. John, Katie)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Scott D. Green's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 11) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/29/21. (JEB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott David Green. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8999691) by Plaintiff GJB, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing IL Certificates)(Green, Scott)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track Two. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/9/2021. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/16/2021 02:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/23/2021. (KCD)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff GJB, L.L.C... (Goldberg, Daniel)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Petition, . (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to Amd NOR - Petition, #2 Ex. B to Amd NOR - Summons, #3 Ex. C to Amd NOR - Notice from DOI, #4 Ex. D to Amd NOR - Pltf's Articles of Inc, #5 Ex. E to Amd NOR - Corr from PA)(Howell, Jennifer) Modified on 10/27/2021 (KCD).
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff GJB, L.L.C.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 11/4/2021. (KCD)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONCERNING JURISDICTION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by November 1, 2021, Defendant shall file an Amended Notice of Removal that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of all parties to this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant does not timely and fully comply with this Order, this matter will be remanded to the Circuit Court of Franklin County, State of Missouri, due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 11/1/2021.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/25/2021. (TMT)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, Franklin County, Missouri, filed by GJB, L.L.C..(BAK)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 Deft State Farm Fire and Casualty Company's ANSWER to Complaint for Breach of Contract and Vexatious Refusal to Pay by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Howell, Jennifer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Parent companies: State Farm Fire and Casualty, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: None,. (Howell, Jennifer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Notice to Plaintiff of Removal (Howell, Jennifer)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Franklin County, case number 21AB-CC00175, with receipt number AMOEDC-8935565, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment State Court File)(Howell, Jennifer) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/22/2021) (ANP).
October 22, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GJB, L.L.C. v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GJB, L.L.C.
Represented By: Daniel L. Goldberg
Represented By: Scott Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. Howell
Represented By: Katie E. St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?